There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Hispanic American Heroes Resolution

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the service, courage, and patriotism of Hispanic Americans who have served and continue to serve as members of the United States Armed Forces.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/09/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
12/05/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
11/09/2007Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/09/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/11/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/11/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/16/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/16/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/16/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/16/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/16/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/06/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/16/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/18/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/18/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/18/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/18/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/18/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/18/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/23/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/23/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/23/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/23/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/24/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/24/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/09/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services11/09/2007 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel12/05/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.253.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.253. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/09/2007)

Hispanic American Heroes Resolution - Recognizes Hispanic Americans who have served and continue to serve as members of the U.S. Armed Forces for their courage on the battlefield, as well as their determination, discipline, selfless service, and patriotism.