Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/13/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 11/14/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/14/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/14/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 11/14/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/14/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/14/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/14/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/14/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 11/14/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/14/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/14/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/05/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/05/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/05/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/05/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/05/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/05/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 12/05/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 12/05/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/05/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/05/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/05/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/05/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/05/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/05/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 12/05/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/05/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/05/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 12/05/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/05/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 01/23/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/23/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/23/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/26/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/26/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/04/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/24/2008