Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/15/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Provides for an adjournment of the House of Representatives from November 15 or 16, 2007, until December 4, 2007 (or until another time of reassembly under this concurrent resolution), and a recess or adjournment of the Senate on any day between November 15, 2007-November 29, 2007, until December 3, 2007 (or until another time of reassembly).

Authorizes the Speaker of the House and the Majority Leader of the Senate, or their respective designees, acting jointly after consultation with the House and Senate Minority Leaders, to notify the Members of the House and the Senate, respectively, to reassemble at such place and time as they may designate whenever, in their opinion, the public interest shall warrant it.