Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/04/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 12/05/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/05/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 12/05/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/05/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 12/05/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/05/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/05/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/05/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 12/05/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/05/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/05/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/05/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 12/05/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/05/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/05/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/05/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/06/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/06/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 12/11/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/11/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/11/2007