Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/15/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/15/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 11/15/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 11/15/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/15/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 11/15/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/15/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 12/05/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 12/05/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 12/05/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/05/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/22/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/22/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 01/22/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/22/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/22/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 01/22/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/22/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/22/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/22/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/22/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/22/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/28/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 01/28/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/28/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 01/28/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/28/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/28/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 01/28/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/28/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 01/28/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 01/28/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/28/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/28/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/28/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/28/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 01/28/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/28/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/28/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 01/28/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 01/29/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/29/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 01/29/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/29/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 01/29/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/29/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 02/06/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/06/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/06/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/07/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/07/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/07/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/07/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/07/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/07/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/07/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/12/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/13/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/14/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/14/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/14/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/11/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/23/2008