Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 12/06/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/06/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 12/11/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/11/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/11/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/11/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/11/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 12/11/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 12/11/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/11/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/11/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/11/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/11/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/12/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/12/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/12/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 12/12/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/12/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/13/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 12/13/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/13/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 12/13/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 12/13/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 12/13/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/13/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 12/17/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/17/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/17/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/17/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 12/17/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 12/17/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/17/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/17/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/17/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 12/17/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 12/17/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/17/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 12/17/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 12/17/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/18/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 12/18/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/19/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/19/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 01/16/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/17/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 01/17/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/29/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/07/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/10/2008