Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/04/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/31/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/05/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/19/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/30/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/31/2008