Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 12/19/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/23/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/23/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/23/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 01/23/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/23/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/23/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/23/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/23/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 01/23/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 01/23/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/23/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/23/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/23/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/23/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/23/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/23/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/29/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 01/29/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/29/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/29/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 01/29/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/29/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/07/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/07/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/07/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/07/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/07/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/21/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/21/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/05/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/05/2008