Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/16/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/27/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/27/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/05/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 03/26/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/14/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/12/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/16/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/16/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/16/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/16/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/16/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/16/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/16/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/16/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/16/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/17/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/17/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/17/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/17/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 10/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/29/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/16/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/13/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/22/2008