Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/12/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/06/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/06/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/06/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/06/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/06/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/06/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/06/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/06/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/06/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/06/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/06/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/06/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/06/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/06/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/05/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/09/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/09/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/09/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/09/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/17/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/20/2008