Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/29/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/29/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/06/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/06/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/06/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/07/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/14/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/14/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/14/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/14/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/14/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/14/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/14/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/14/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/14/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 02/14/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/14/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/14/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/14/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/14/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/14/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/14/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/14/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/14/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/14/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/14/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/14/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/14/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/14/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/14/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/14/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/14/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/14/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/05/2008