Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (02/14/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that, when the House adjourns: (1) on Thursday, February 14, 2008, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Friday, February 15, 2008; (2) on Friday, February 15, 2008, it stand adjourned until 10 a.m. on Tuesday, February 19, 2008; (3) on Tuesday, February 19, 2008, it stand adjourned until noon on Thursday, February 21, 2008; and (4) on Thursday, February 21, 2008, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Monday, February 25, 2008.

Declares that, when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Friday, February 15, 2008, through Friday, February 22, 2008, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Monday, February 25, 2008.