Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/25/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/25/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/25/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/27/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/27/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/04/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/05/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/12/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/12/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/14/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/14/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/02/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/03/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 04/15/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/15/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/17/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/17/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/24/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/24/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/24/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/24/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/24/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/05/2008