Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/10/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/31/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/31/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/31/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/31/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/31/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/31/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/31/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/31/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/31/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/14/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 04/14/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/14/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/14/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/22/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/22/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/22/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/29/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/29/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/29/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/05/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/05/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/08/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/13/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/14/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/15/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/15/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/15/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/15/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/15/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/15/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/15/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/15/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/15/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/20/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/20/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/20/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/20/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/20/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/20/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/20/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/20/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/20/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/20/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/20/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/22/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/22/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/22/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/04/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/04/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/04/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/09/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/09/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/09/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/09/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/09/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/09/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/09/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/17/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/17/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/17/2008