There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting the observance of Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/31/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 371 - 0 (Roll no. 149).(text: CR H1787)
02/25/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
04/01/2008SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
03/31/2008-7:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/31/2008-7:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 371 - 0 (Roll no. 149). (text: CR H1787)
03/31/2008-7:06pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1791)
03/31/2008-3:19pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/31/2008-3:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 302.
03/31/2008-3:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1787-1789)
03/31/2008-3:01pmHouseMr. Wynn moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
02/25/2008HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/25/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/25/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (124)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/25/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/25/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/28/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/04/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/06/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/06/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/06/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/06/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/10/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/10/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/10/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/10/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/10/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/10/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/10/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/10/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/10/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/10/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/10/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/10/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/10/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/10/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/10/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/10/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/10/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/10/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/10/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/10/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/10/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/10/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/10/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/10/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/10/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/10/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/10/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/10/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/10/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/10/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/10/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/10/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/10/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/10/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/10/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/10/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/10/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/10/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/11/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/11/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/11/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/11/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/12/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/12/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/25/2008 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/25/2008 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions04/01/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.302.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.302. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/31/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Expresses support for the observance of Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month to provide a special opportunity to offer education on the importance of early detection and screening.