Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/25/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/25/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/28/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/04/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/06/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/06/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/06/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/06/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/10/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/10/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/10/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/10/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/10/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/10/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/10/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/10/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/10/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/10/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/10/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/10/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/10/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/10/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/10/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/10/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/10/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/10/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/10/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/10/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/10/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/10/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/10/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/10/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/10/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/10/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/10/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/10/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/10/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/10/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/10/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/10/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/10/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/10/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/10/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/10/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/10/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/10/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/11/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/11/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/11/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/11/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/12/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/12/2008