Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/28/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/10/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/10/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/13/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/13/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/13/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/02/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/03/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/03/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/09/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/09/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/01/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/06/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/06/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/14/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/19/2008