Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/11/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/11/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/11/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/11/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 03/11/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/12/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/12/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/12/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/12/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/12/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/12/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/12/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/12/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/12/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/12/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/12/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/12/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/12/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/12/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/12/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/12/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/12/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/12/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/13/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/13/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/13/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/13/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/13/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/13/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/13/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/13/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/13/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/13/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/13/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/03/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/03/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/08/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/08/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/09/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/10/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/10/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/10/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/16/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/16/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/23/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/23/2008