Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/31/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/31/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/31/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/31/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/31/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/31/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/02/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/02/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/03/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/03/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/03/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/08/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/08/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/10/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/14/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/14/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/14/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/14/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/16/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/17/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/22/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/29/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/29/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/29/2008