Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/07/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/07/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 09/07/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/07/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/07/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/07/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/17/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/17/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/12/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 12/12/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/12/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/12/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 12/12/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 12/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/12/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 12/12/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/12/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 12/12/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/12/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 12/12/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/22/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/28/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/28/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/28/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/29/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/07/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/05/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/05/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/05/2008