Text: H.Con.Res.322 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Received in Senate (04/24/2008)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF.

 
[Congressional Bills 110th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Con. Res. 322 Received in Senate (RDS)]

  2d Session
H. CON. RES. 322


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                             April 24, 2008

                                Received

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION


 
Recognizing the 60th anniversary of the founding of the modern State of 
 Israel and reaffirming the bonds of close friendship and cooperation 
                 between the United States and Israel.

Whereas on November 29, 1947, the United Nations General Assembly voted to 
        partition the British Mandate of Palestine and create a Jewish state;
Whereas on May 14, 1948, the people of Israel proclaimed the establishment of 
        the sovereign and independent State of Israel, and the United States 
        Government established full diplomatic relations with Israel;
Whereas the desire of the Jewish people to establish an independent modern State 
        of Israel is an outgrowth of the existence of the historic kingdom of 
        Israel established in the Land of Israel 3,000 years ago, with the city 
        of Jerusalem as its capital;
Whereas for over 2,000 years, there has been continuous Jewish presence and 
        residence in the land comprising the modern State of Israel;
Whereas the establishment of the modern State of Israel as a homeland for the 
        Jewish people followed the slaughter of more than 6,000,000 European 
        Jews during the Holocaust;
Whereas since its establishment 60 years ago, the modern State of Israel has 
        rebuilt a nation, forged a new and dynamic democratic society, and 
        created a thriving economic, political, cultural, and intellectual life 
        despite the heavy costs of war, terrorism, and unjustified diplomatic 
        and economic boycotts against the people of Israel;
Whereas the people of Israel have established a vibrant, pluralistic, democratic 
        political system, including freedom of speech, association, and 
        religion; a vigorously free press; free, fair and open elections; the 
        rule of law; a fully independent judiciary; and other democratic 
        principles and practices;
Whereas Israel has developed some of the leading universities in the world, and 
        8 Israeli citizens have been awarded the Nobel Prize;
Whereas Israel has developed an advanced, entrepreneurial economy, is among the 
        world's leaders in the high-tech industry, and is at the forefront of 
        research and development in the field of renewable energy sources;
Whereas Israel regularly sends humanitarian aid, search-and-rescue teams, mobile 
        hospitals, and other emergency supplies, to help victims of disasters 
        around the world, including the 1994 Rwandan civil war, the 1998 bombing 
        of the United States Embassy in Kenya, the 1999 earthquakes in Turkey, 
        the 2004 Indian Ocean tsunami, the 2005 hurricanes along the southern 
        coast of the United States, and the 2007 fires in Greece;
Whereas Israel has absorbed millions of Jews from countries throughout the world 
        and fully integrated them into Israeli society;
Whereas Israel has bravely defended itself from repeated terrorist and military 
        attacks since its independence;
Whereas successive leaders of Israel have sought to achieve peace with Israel's 
        Arab neighbors;
Whereas Israel has established peaceful bilateral relations with neighboring 
        Egypt and Jordan and has made its desire to establish peaceful relations 
        with all Arab states abundantly clear;
Whereas for 6 decades, the United States and Israel have maintained a special 
        relationship based on mutually shared democratic values, common 
        strategic interests, and moral bonds of friendship and mutual respect;
Whereas the American people feel a strong affinity for the Israeli people based 
        on common values and shared cultural heritage; and
Whereas the United States continues to regard Israel as a strong and trusted 
        ally and an important strategic partner: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), 
That Congress--
            (1) recognizes the historic significance of the 60th 
        anniversary of the reestablishment of the sovereign and 
        independent State of Israel as a homeland for the Jewish 
        people;
            (2) reaffirms its enduring support for Israel as Israel 
        pursues peace with its neighbors;
            (3) reaffirms its support for Israel's right to defend 
        itself against threats to its security and existence;
            (4) commends the people of Israel for their remarkable 
        achievements in building a new state and a pluralistic, 
        democratic society in the face of terrorism, as well as 
        hostility, ostracism, and belligerence from many of their 
        neighbors;
            (5) reaffirms the bonds of friendship and cooperation which 
        have existed between the United States and Israel for the past 
        60 years, and commits to strengthening those bonds; and
            (6) extends the warmest congratulations and best wishes to 
        the State of Israel and the Israeli people for a peaceful, 
        prosperous, and successful future.

            Passed the House of Representatives April 23, 2008.

            Attest:

                                            LORRAINE C. MILLER,

                                                                 Clerk.