There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting the goals and ideals of the National Day of Silence with respect to anti-lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender name-calling, bullying, and harassment faced by individuals in schools.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/15/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
04/28/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/15/2008Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
04/15/2008Referred to House Education and Labor
Action By: House of Representatives
04/15/2008Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/15/2008Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/15/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/15/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/15/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/15/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/15/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/17/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/24/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/24/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/01/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/01/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor04/15/2008 Referred to
House Judiciary04/15/2008 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties04/28/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.328.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.328. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/15/2008)

Supports the goals and ideals of the Day of Silence (during which students vow to remain silent to bring attention to the harassment and discrimination faced by lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender people in schools). Encourages each state, city, and local education authority to adopt laws and policies to prohibit name-calling, bullying, harassment, and discrimination against students, teachers, and other school staff regardless of their sexual orientation and gender identity or gender expression.