Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/16/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/16/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/18/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/18/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/18/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/18/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/18/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/18/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/19/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/19/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/22/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/24/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/24/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/05/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/05/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/05/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/05/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/15/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/15/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/16/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/01/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/01/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/01/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/12/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/21/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/15/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/31/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/31/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/08/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/10/2008