Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/17/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/17/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/23/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/23/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/23/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/23/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/23/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/24/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/29/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/29/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/30/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/01/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/01/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/01/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/01/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/01/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/01/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/01/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/01/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/01/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/01/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/01/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/01/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/01/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/01/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/01/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/01/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/01/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 05/01/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/01/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/01/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/01/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/01/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/01/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/01/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/01/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/01/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/01/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/01/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/01/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/01/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/01/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/06/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/06/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/06/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/06/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/06/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/06/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/07/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/08/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/08/2008