Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/29/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/29/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/29/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/29/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/29/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/29/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/29/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/30/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/30/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/30/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/30/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/05/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/05/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/13/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/05/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/05/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/10/2008