Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/20/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/20/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/10/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/17/2008