Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/24/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 04/24/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/24/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/24/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/29/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/29/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/29/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/29/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/29/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/30/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/30/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/30/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/30/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/30/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/01/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/05/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/07/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/07/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/07/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/13/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/14/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/15/2008