Text: H.Con.Res.334 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (05/22/2008)

 
[Congressional Bills 110th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Con. Res. 334 Referred in Senate (RFS)]

  2d Session
H. CON. RES. 334


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                              May 22, 2008

        Received and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION


 
Supporting the goals and objectives of a National Military Appreciation 
                                 Month.

Whereas the vigilance of the members of the Armed Forces has been instrumental 
        to the preservation of the freedom, security, and prosperity enjoyed by 
        the people of the United States;
Whereas the success of the Armed Forces depends on the dedicated service of its 
        members, their families,

              

 and the civilian employees of the Department of Defense and the Coast 
Guard;

Whereas the role of the United States as a world leader requires a military 
        force that is well-trained, well-equipped, and appropriately sized;
Whereas the Federal Government has a responsibility to raise awareness of and 
        respect for this aspect of the heritage of the United States and to 
        encourage the people of the United States to dedicate themselves to the 
        values and principles for which Americans have served and sacrificed 
        throughout the history of the Nation;
Whereas service in the Armed Forces entails special hazards and demands 
        extraordinary sacrifices from service members and their families;
Whereas the support of the families of service members enhances the 
        effectiveness and capabilities of the Armed Forces;
Whereas the observance of events recognizing the contributions of the Armed 
        Forces is a tangible and highly effective way of sustaining morale and 
        improving quality of life for service members and their families;
Whereas on April 30, 1999, the Senate passed S. Res. 33 (106th Congress), 
        entitled ``Designating May 1999 as `National Military Appreciation 
        Month''', calling on the people of the United States, in a symbolic act 
        of unity, to observe a National Military Appreciation Month in May 1999, 
        to honor the current and former members of the Armed Forces, including 
        those who have died in the pursuit of freedom and peace;
Whereas on March 24, 2004, the House of Representatives passed H. Con. Res. 328 
        (108th Congress), entitled ``Recognizing and honoring the United States 
        Armed Forces and supporting the goals and objectives of a National 
        Military Appreciation Month,'' and on April 26, 2004, the Senate passed 
        H. Con. Res. 328 by unanimous consent; and
Whereas it is important to emphasize to the people of the United States the 
        relevance of the history and activities of the Armed Forces through an 
        annual National Military Appreciation Month that includes associated 
        local and national observances and activities: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), 
That Congress--
            (1) supports the goals and objectives of a National 
        Military Appreciation Month; and
            (2) urges the President to issue a proclamation calling on 
        the people of the United States, all Federal departments and 
        agencies, States, localities, organizations, and media to 
        annually observe a National Military Appreciation Month with 
        appropriate ceremonies and activities.

            Passed the House of Representatives May 21, 2008.

            Attest:

                                            LORRAINE C. MILLER,

                                                                 Clerk.