Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/01/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/01/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/01/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/01/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/01/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/01/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/01/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/01/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/01/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/01/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/07/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/07/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/07/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/07/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/07/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/07/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/07/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/07/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/08/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/08/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/08/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/13/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/13/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/13/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/13/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/13/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/14/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/20/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/20/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/20/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/20/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/20/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/20/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/20/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/20/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/20/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/20/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/21/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/21/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/03/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/03/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/03/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/03/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/03/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/03/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/03/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/03/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/05/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/05/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/09/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/09/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/09/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/10/2008