Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/29/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/29/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/30/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/30/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/30/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/30/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/01/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/05/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/08/2008