Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/29/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 04/29/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/29/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/29/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/30/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/30/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/30/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/30/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/30/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/05/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/05/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/05/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/05/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/07/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/07/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/07/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/07/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/08/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/21/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/21/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/04/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/04/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/09/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/17/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/17/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/18/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/24/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/25/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/26/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/24/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/24/2008