Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/05/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/14/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/14/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/14/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/14/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/14/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/14/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/14/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/14/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/14/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/14/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/14/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/14/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/14/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/14/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/14/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/15/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/15/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/19/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/19/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/19/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/19/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/19/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/19/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/19/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 05/19/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/21/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/21/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/21/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/21/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/21/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/21/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/22/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/03/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/03/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/03/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/03/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/03/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/03/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/05/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/05/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/09/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/09/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/09/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/11/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/11/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/23/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/23/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/23/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/23/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/23/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/23/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/23/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/09/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/17/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/17/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/24/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/24/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/24/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/31/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/31/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/10/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/10/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/10/2008