Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/22/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/22/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/22/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 01/22/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/22/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/22/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/22/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/22/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 01/24/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/24/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/29/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/29/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/29/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 01/29/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/30/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/31/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/05/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/05/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/05/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/05/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/05/2007