Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/14/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/14/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/14/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/14/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/14/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/14/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/14/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/14/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/03/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/03/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/04/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/09/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/09/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/09/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/09/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/09/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/09/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 06/09/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/09/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/09/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/09/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/11/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/11/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/11/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/12/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/12/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/17/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/17/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/17/2008