Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/15/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/20/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/20/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/17/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/17/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/17/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/17/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/17/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/17/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/17/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/17/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/17/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/17/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/17/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/17/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/17/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/17/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/17/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/17/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/17/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/17/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/22/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/23/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/23/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/23/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/23/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/23/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/23/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/23/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/23/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/23/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/23/2008