Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/15/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/05/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/10/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/23/2008