Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/20/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/25/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/25/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/25/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/25/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/25/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/25/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/26/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/08/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/16/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/22/2008