There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Encouraging all States to enact laws requiring photo identification to vote in elections.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/20/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/20/2008Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/20/2008Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/22/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/22/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 05/22/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/04/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/04/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/04/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/04/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/04/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/04/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/04/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/04/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/04/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/12/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/12/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/12/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/24/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/24/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/24/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/24/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/24/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/16/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/31/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/16/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration05/20/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.357.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.357. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/20/2008)

Encourages all states that have not already done so to swiftly enact laws requiring voters to present current, valid, government-issued photo identification based on proof of U.S. citizenship in order to vote in elections.

Applauds those states that have already implemented vigorous photo identification laws to secure the integrity of the democratic process.