Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/22/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 05/22/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/22/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/03/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/03/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/03/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/10/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/10/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/10/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/10/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/10/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/12/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/12/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/12/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/17/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/17/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/17/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/18/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/16/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/22/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/22/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/22/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/29/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/29/2008