Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/03/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/03/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/03/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/03/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/03/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/03/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/05/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/05/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/09/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/09/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/09/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/09/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/11/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/11/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/17/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/19/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/25/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/22/2008