Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 05/22/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/10/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/10/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/10/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/10/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/10/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/10/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/10/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/10/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/10/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/10/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/10/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/10/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/10/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/10/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/11/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/11/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/11/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/11/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/17/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/26/2008