Text: H.Con.Res.365 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (06/27/2008)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 110th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Con. Res. 365 Placed on Calendar Senate (PCS)]






                                                       Calendar No. 857
110th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. CON. RES. 365


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                             June 27, 2008

            Received; read twice and placed on the calendar

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION


 
                  Honoring the life of Robert Mondavi.

Whereas Robert Mondavi, a much-loved and admired man of many talents, passed 
        away on May 16, 2008, at the age of 94;
Whereas Robert Mondavi will be fondly and most famously remembered for his work 
        in producing and promoting California wines on an international scale;
Whereas Robert Gerald Mondavi was born to Italian immigrant parents, Cesare and 
        Rose, on June 18, 1913, in Virginia, Minnesota, and his family later 
        moved to Lodi, California, where he attended Lodi High School;
Whereas after graduating from Stanford University in 1937 with a degree in 
        economics and business administration, Robert Mondavi joined his father 
        and younger brother, Peter, in running the Charles Krug Winery in the 
        Napa Valley of California;
Whereas Robert Mondavi left Krug Winery in 1965 to establish his own winery in 
        the Napa Valley, and, in 1966, motivated by his vision that California 
        could produce world-class wines, he founded the first major winery built 
        in Napa Valley since Prohibition, the Robert Mondavi Winery;
Whereas in the later 1960s, the release of the Robert Mondavi Winery's Cabernet 
        Sauvignon opened the eyes of the world to the potential of the Napa 
        Valley region;
Whereas Robert Mondavi introduced new and innovative techniques of wine 
        production, such as the use of stainless steel tanks to produce wines, 
        like his now-legendary Fume Blanc;
Whereas as a tireless advocate for California wine and food, and the Napa 
        Valley, Robert Mondavi was convinced that California wines could compete 
        with established European brands, and his confidence in the potential of 
        Napa Valley wines was confirmed in 1976 when California wines defeated 
        some well-known French vintages at the historic Paris Wine Tasting, or 
        ``Judgement of Paris'', wine competition;
Whereas in the late 1970s, Robert Mondavi created the first French-American wine 
        venture when he joined with Baron Philippe de Rothschild in creating the 
        Opus One Winery in Oakville, which produced its first vintage in 1979;
Whereas the success of the Robert Mondavi Winery, and the many international 
        ventures Robert Mondavi pursued, allowed him to donate generously to 
        various charitable causes, including the Robert Mondavi Institute for 
        Wine and Food Science and Robert and Margrit Mondavi Center for 
        Performing Arts, both affiliated with the University of California, 
        Davis, and the establishment of the American Center for Wine, Food, and 
        the Arts;
Whereas those who knew Robert Mondavi recognized him as a uniquely passionate 
        and brilliant man who took pride in promoting causes that he held close 
        to his heart;
Whereas Robert Mondavi's work as an ambassador for wine will be remembered 
        fondly by all those whose lives he touched; and
Whereas Robert Mondavi will be deeply missed in the Napa Valley, in California, 
        and throughout the world: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), 
That Congress honors the life of Robert Mondavi, a true pioneer and 
patriarch of the California wine industry.

            Passed the House of Representatives June 26, 2008.

            Attest:

                                            LORRAINE C. MILLER,

                                                                 Clerk.

                               By Robert F. Reeves,

                                                          Deputy Clerk.




                                                       Calendar No. 857

110th CONGRESS

  2d Session

                            H. CON. RES. 365

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION

                  Honoring the life of Robert Mondavi.

_______________________________________________________________________

                             June 27, 2008

            Received; read twice and placed on the calendar