Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/10/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/17/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/17/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/17/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/19/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/19/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/20/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/09/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2008