Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/12/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/12/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/12/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/12/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/17/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/17/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/17/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/17/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/17/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/17/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/17/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/18/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/18/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/18/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/18/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/18/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/14/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/15/2008