Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/25/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/25/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/17/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/17/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/23/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/23/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/23/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/30/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/30/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/10/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/10/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/10/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/10/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/10/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/10/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/10/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/10/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/10/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/10/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/10/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/10/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/10/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/11/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/11/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/11/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/15/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/23/2008