Summary: H.Con.Res.379 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (06/26/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that, when the House adjourns on the legislative day of Thursday, June 26, 2008, or Friday, June 27, 2008, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Tuesday, July 8, 2008.

Declares that, when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, June 26, 2008, through Friday, July 4, 2008, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Monday, July 7, 2008.