Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/06/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/06/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/06/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/06/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/06/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/12/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/12/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/12/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/12/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/12/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/27/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/27/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/27/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/08/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/08/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/08/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/08/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/08/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/16/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/16/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/16/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/16/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/09/2007