Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 07/22/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/22/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/24/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/31/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/31/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/31/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/31/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/31/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/08/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/08/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/08/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/08/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/08/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/08/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/08/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/08/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/11/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/15/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/16/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/17/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/17/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/17/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/18/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/18/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/18/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 09/18/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/18/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/18/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/18/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/18/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/18/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/18/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/18/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/18/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/18/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/22/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/22/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/22/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/22/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/22/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/22/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/22/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/22/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/22/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/22/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/22/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/22/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/22/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/22/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/22/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/22/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/22/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/22/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/22/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/22/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/22/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/22/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/22/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/22/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/22/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/22/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/22/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/22/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/22/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/22/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/23/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/23/2008
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/23/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/23/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/23/2008