Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 07/29/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/16/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/16/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/16/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/16/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/16/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/16/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/16/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/16/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/16/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/18/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/18/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/18/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/25/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/25/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/25/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/25/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/25/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/25/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/25/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/25/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/25/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/25/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/25/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/29/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/29/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/29/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/29/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/03/2008