Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/10/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/11/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/17/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/17/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/23/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/23/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/24/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/24/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/24/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/24/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/24/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 09/24/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/24/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/24/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/24/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/24/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/24/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/24/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/25/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/25/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/25/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/25/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/25/2008